Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Belknap, Robert Carl filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2020 |
CategoryRfr Restoration Of Firearm Rights |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Restoring Firearms Rights | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing P - RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS Judge: Gregerson, David E |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing P - RESTORE FIREARMS RIGHTS Judge: Gregerson, David E |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Response | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.