Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Boose, Robyn, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryGdn Guardianship |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing LETTERS EXPIRE 12/31/2022 |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing LETTERS EXPIRE 8/28/2022 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing RPT/ACCT DUE 5/28/2022 |
|
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing PCP/INV DUE 12/3/2021 |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship Capacity Returns | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Hearing Tracking/Guardian Final Report & Discharge Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing cited 11/05/21, Dept. 1. Check for approval |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order APPROVING GAL FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.