Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Tami, Eleanor I, against Pisan, Bridget R, Pisan, John Doe W H, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Stahnke presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Stahnke Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 8: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 7: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE DANIEL STAHNKE; |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment 6: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service 4: NT RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.