Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Berco Finance Corp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Ferrero, Edward Louis, against Doolittle, Helen, Willey, Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 11: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Certified Mail 9: RETURN RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL; |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 8: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 7: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 1ST; |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 6: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 5: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Foreign Judgment 4: NOT OF FILING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT; |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary 3: JUDGMENT SUMMARY; |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 2: AFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.