Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Renn, Mark, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hojem, Thomas Eric, against Rittierodt, Corianne, represented by Foley, Douglas Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with David E. Gregerson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 27: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE DAVID E. GREGERSON; |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction 26: SATISFACTION OF ARB AWARD; |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 25: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 24: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 22: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 13: ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL DATE; 10-24-2016; #9 12 PERSON JURY 3 DAYS 9:00AM; |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | AR Arbitration Calendar | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 16: CITATION; 09-30-2016; 9 D-MT F/LEAVE F/COURT TO AMND; NOTE SET TRIAL 9AM; |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 20: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.