Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Nagrodski, Ashley A, against Pfingsten, Sherry Kim, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Robert A. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 14: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
M8 Motion Docket Dept. 8 Judge Clark 9 P-SUPPL PROCEED 10:30AM |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; PER ATTY SUTTELL FOR 05-20-11; |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE RICHARD A. MELNICK; |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 13: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 05-20-2011M8; 9 P-SUPPL PROCEED 10:30AM; |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor 12: MOTION&AFDT EXAM OF JDGMNT DEBTOR; |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 11: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
M6 Motion Docket Dept. 6 Judge Fairgrieve SPPLMNTL PROCEED 10:30AM |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; PER ATTY SUTTELL FOR 03-25-11; |
|
March 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 10: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 03-25-2011M6; SPPLMNTL PROCEED 10:30AM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.