Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Masonry Industry Trust Administration Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Capstone Contracting Inc, Richardson, April, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Robert A. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2010 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 19: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
M9 Motion Docket Dept. 9 Judge Lewis 9 P-SUPP PROCEEDINGS 9:00AM |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 18: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; PER ATTY EWERS FOR 05-27-11; |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 17: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 16: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion 14: MOTION F/SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ROBERT A. LEWIS; |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons 13: SUMMONS; |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 15: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 05-27-2011M9; 9 P-SUPP PROCEEDINGS 9:00AM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.