Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Andrew'S Court Homeowners Assoc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Coxey, Gregory Brian, against Kuvelas, Tabith, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Stahnke presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 44: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 42: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 43: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 41: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 1ST; |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 40: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 39: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 38: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 37: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 36: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 34: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.