Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Medina, Derek G filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 2 DAY NJT |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Set Trial | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Clerks Setting | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling TRIAL SETTING |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 2DNJT |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Mack, Brandon R |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Order of Child Support | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pending Decision
Judge: Mack, Brandon R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.