Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zozosky, Don, Payne, Jerry, Ackerman, Scott, A2Z Enterprises, Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Morrison, Kellie, Morrison, Dan, Morrison Excavating, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2017 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice 16: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 15: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 14: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CM Civil Motions RE RELEASE OF RECORDED LIEN |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
CM Civil Motions SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 13: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice 12: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF; COUNSEL; |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.