Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guardian Management, Llc For And On Behalf Of, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Poloni, Jeana Kay, against All Other Occupants, Madison, Ashlee, Van Auken, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 15: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution 14: WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Directing Issuance of Writ 13: ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT; |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion 12: MOTION TO REISSUE WRIT OF; RESTITUTION; |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN RE WRIT; NON-EXECUTABLE/EXPIRED; |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return of Service Not Served 10: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERV-NOT SERVED; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution 9: WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 8: FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF; LAW, JUDGMENT AND ORDER ISSUING; WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.