Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Keith J. Gale General Engineering, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Plaskett, Gregory Charles, against G & K East View Estates, Llc, represented by Miller, Kenneth M, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Keith J. Gale General Engineering, Inc. vs. G&K East View ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 20 2010 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order 213520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant STIPULATION AND ORDER [213520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff Status : 241110 - Vacated/Set Aside; Date: 2010-08-19 00:00:00REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Add'l Description: Amended Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : AMENDED Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.