Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hawes, Douglas, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Schwantor, Elizabeth Leigh, against Pozgay, Melody, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts with Erik S. Rohrer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 12: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE ERIK ROHRER-DEPT 2; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 11: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AM Civil Motions MOTION FOR DEFAULT/JUDGMENT |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 10: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 8: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT; |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 9: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S; MOTION FOR DEFAULT ORDER AGAINST; DEFENDANT MELODY POZGAY; |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue 7: NOTICE OF ISSUE; 02-21-2014AM; MOTION FOR DEFAULT/JUDGMENT; |
|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney 6: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response 5: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT & SUMMONS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.