Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tiderman, Joe, Tiderman, Valerie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Martineau, John Doe, Martineau, Meredith, represented by Kopta, Joseph R., in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 10: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment 9: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRAT.; |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Statement of Arbitrability 8: STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer 7: DEF'S ANSWER TO PLA'S COMPLAINT; |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 6: DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 4: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Received - 12 Jury 5: JURY DEMAND RECEIVED - TWELVE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.