Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Doran, Gregory Dale filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts with W. Brent Basden presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2012 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 11: MOTION HEARING; COMM. W.BRENT BASDEN-DEPT.3; |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order 10: ORDER TERMINATING ORDER FOR PROT; |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Removal of Court File 9: ORDER AUTHOR REMOVAL OF COURT FILE; |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
KE Domestic Violence/Anti-Harassment PROTECTION ORDER |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 6: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 7: ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
|
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; COMMISSIONER W. BRENT BASDEN; |
|
December 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter 5: LETTER FROM GREGORY DORAN TO COURT; |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 4: MOTION HEARING; COMMISSIONER W. BRENT BASDEN DEPT-3; |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order for Protection 3: TEMP ORD FOR PROTECTION; 12-21-2012KE; PROTECTION ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.