Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
First Federal Savings & Loan Association Of Port Angeles, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Colley, Gary Richard, against Hafer, Eleanore D, Hafer, Raymond F, represented by Davis, William Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 7: OR GRANTING PLA'S MOT FOR DISMISSAL; |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 6: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISMISSAL; BEFORE RESTING; |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 5: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR JUDGMENT ON; PROMISSORY NOTE; |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS; |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.