Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Elliott, Christina, Elliott, Geoffrey, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Angeles Mill Works & Lumber Co, Inc Washington Corporation, Pacific Lumber Resources, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 10: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 9: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice 8: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/; FINKELSTEIN FOR PLAINTIFF; |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response 7: RESPONSE; |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 5: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.