Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wood, Tara Leigh, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Krull, John Davidson, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy S. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2023 |
CategoryDin Dissolution Of Marriage With No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
November 21, 2023 | Temporary Family Law Order | ||
November 20, 2023 | Notice Striking Hearing | ||
November 20, 2023 | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | ||
November 20, 2023 |
Temporary Order
Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
||
November 02, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
October 31, 2023 | Acceptance of Service | ||
October 31, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
October 30, 2023 | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | ||
October 30, 2023 |
Temporary Order
Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.