Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daley, Amy M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Daley, Mark D, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy S. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2023 |
CategoryDin Dissolution Of Marriage With No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 | Set Trial | ||
December 13, 2023 | Response to Statement of Arbitrability | ||
December 13, 2023 | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | ||
October 27, 2023 | Temporary Family Law Order | ||
October 23, 2023 |
Motion Hearing SHORTEN TIME/TEMPORARY ORDERS Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
||
October 23, 2023 | Motion Hearing | ||
October 20, 2023 |
Reply MARK DALEY |
||
October 20, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
October 19, 2023 |
Sealed Financial Source Documents PETITIONER'S WAGE STATEMENTS |
||
October 19, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit MARK DALEY RESPONSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.