Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Otero, Monica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcpartland, Bryce Patrick, against Corter, Glean, represented by Heinson, Timothy J, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy S. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice DEFENDANT CORTER |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING LEAVE TO INTERVENE/STIPULATED |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Compelling Discovery | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.