Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Clement, Marilyn J, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Steinberg, Charles Raymond, against City Of Chelan, represented by Plant, Quinn N, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Kristin Ferrara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin Ferrara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Courts Decision | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit MARILYN CLEMENT |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit BARBARA BROUNER |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.