Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robb, Carole L, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brangwin, John Michael, against Confluence Health, Otis Elevator Company, Wenatchee Valley Hospital, represented by Moore, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Defense Respondent Requested | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Jourdan, Robert E |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Unknown Party | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Jourdan, Robert E |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket AMENDED |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense CONFLUENCE AND WENATCHEE VALLEY HOSPITAL |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense OTIS ELEVATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.