Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Housing Authority Of Chelan Co, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Harris, Aaron J, against Garcia, Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution Issued 9: WRIT OF RESTITUTION ISSUED; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Restitution 8: ORDER FOR WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment 7: JUDGMENT 17-9-01309-9; |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
HD Motions UNLAWFUL DETAINER 9:30 |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 5: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 12-29-2017HD; UNLAWFUL DETAINER 9:30; |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 4: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.