Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Slatta, Kirk, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Volyn, Scott Andrew, against Houck, Mary V, Houck, Peter, Houck, Verbon, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2016 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 7: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service 5: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE PETER SPAGDON; |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 4: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons 3: AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.