Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Licensing - Administrative case against Licensing, Dept Of, represented by Lehrman, Dale Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryDol Appeal Licensing Revocation |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeLicensing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 7: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
HD Motions CLERK'S DISMISSAL 9:30 |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 6: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; 03-17-2017HD; CLERK'S DISMISSAL 9:30; |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certification 5: CERTIFICATION OF ADMIN RECORD; |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 4: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal on RALJ Decision Lower Court 2: NOTICE OF APPL ON RALJ DEC (LWR CT); |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 3: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.