Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bratton, Beth A filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2014 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipts 25: RECEIPT(S) WENATCHEE CITY POLICE; |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 24: 2ND AGREED AMENDED ORD FOR PROTECT; |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipts 23: RECEIPT(S) WENATCHEE POLICE DEPT; |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 22: AMENDED ORDER FOR PROTECTION; |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipts 21: RECEIPT(S) WENATCHEE POLICE DEPT; |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 17: ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NonJury Trial 18: NON-JURY TRIAL; |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
DV Domestic Violence - Tuesday PROTECTION ORDER 9:00 |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 20: 2ND RESPONDING DCLR BRYAN WILLIAMS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.