Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Lowe, Laurence, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 16: SATISFACTION JUDGMENT 13-9-1456-4; |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 15: JDGMT ON ANSWER 13-9-1456-4; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 14: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 13: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARN JUDGMENT; |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 12: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT 13-9-1456-4; |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT 13-9-01456-4; |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 13-9-1456-4; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: ALCOA INC , NFN; |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 8: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 7: DEFAULT JUDGMENT 13-9-1456-4; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.