Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chelan County, filed a(n) Pfa Property Fairness Act case represented by Hinkle, Susan E, against Jones, Jeffrey C, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Kristin Ferrara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryPfa Property Fairness Act |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibits Received | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition TO DISBURSE BOND FUNDS |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing To disburse funds Judge: Ferrera, Kristin M |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DISBURSE SUPERSEDEAS BOND |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings GRANTING MOTION TO DISBURSE BOND |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit TIM LYKKEN |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.