Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Salgado, Mark, Sauvageau, Thomas, represented by Bitcon, Sharon Jean, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 18: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 17: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT 15-9-778-5; |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 16: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice 15: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLA'S ADDRESS; |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 14: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; THEILE, ERIC MICHAEL; |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 13: DEFAULT JUDGMENT 15-9-778-5; |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 11: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 12: DECLARATION OF SUM CERTAIN; |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 10: MOTION FOR DEFAULT T SAUVAGEAU; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.