Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wallace Corff, Rebecca S, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Derenick, Kelby J, against Kenmore Team Property Management Llc, Parrish, Mandi S, represented by Davidson, Michael John, Foley, Douglas Fredrick, Symmes, William M., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendants List of Witnesses Kenmore Team Property Management LLC |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Mandi S. Parish |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer - Dft's |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.