Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Hodges, Charley, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Reich, G Parker, Zuanich, Robert Phillip, against Estate Of Cheri Nagao, Nagao, Robert G, Walmart Inc, represented by Grennan, Philip B., O'Donnell, Michael L., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts Superior with Joseph M. Burrowes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice - Stipulated |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Digital/SMC/B Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TTO/ Pltf's Motion to Continue Trial Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TTO/ Pet Mot to Continue Trial |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD Judge: Whitmire, Megan |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit AMENDED Michael O'Donnell |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.