Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Argonaut Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Comfort, Joel R, against Shari'S Management Corporation, represented by Duggan, Drew Fitzgerald, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Cameron Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCameron Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryUnd Commercial Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice - Stipulation |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer UND/Order for Writ of Restitution Judge: Mitchell, Cameron |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Tina Sohne |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Defendant's |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer UND/Writ of Restitution Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.