Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Irwin, Betty, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barber, Levi F, against Lamb Weston Inc, represented by Philip, Neal J., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return On - No Ex Parte fee included |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.