Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chvatal, Patricia Joan filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2019 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO MATHEW PURCELL |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Sealing Document
Judge: Klym, Arthur D |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Klym, Arthur D |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIC/0: MOT TO SEAL RECORDS RE: MINOR CHILD Judge: Klym, Arthur D |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service PATRICIA CHVATAL |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER SEALING RECORDS RE: MINOR CHILD |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Mailed to Olympia | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.