Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Columbia State Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sinnott, Jeanne Kallage, against I-3 Global Inc, Lapp, Kristopher J, represented by Hames, William L., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Joseph M. Burrowes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Closure for Want of Prosecution | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party I-3 Global Inc. |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.