Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryDin Dissolution Of Marriage With No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIN/7: RESP MOT RE: HOME Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIN/6: RESP MOT RE: HOME Judge: Campbell, Darin R |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Campbell, Darin R |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service JEREMY BISHOP |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply DCLR OF AMRIK SIHOTA |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Campbell, Darin R |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIN/5: RSP MOT TO SELL/REFINANCE HOME Judge: Campbell, Darin R |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIN/4: RESO MOT TO SELL/REFINANCE HOME Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing DIN/3: RESP MOT TO SELL/REFINANCE HOME Judge: Campbell, Darin R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.