Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mercado, Christopher Jason, against Steinruck, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Bruce A. Spanner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Issued |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Garnishment |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 009: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 008: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Garnishment 007: AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE BRUCE A. SPANNER; |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DEFAULT; | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 006: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.