Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Homan, Nancy, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Koehle, Justine Theresa, against Fire And Earth Homes Llc, Wesco Insurance Company, represented by Friedrich, Alexander A., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Jacqueline Stam presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds Stipulated Motion |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | TR Trial Docket - Trial | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) PRETRIAL; 11-29-2018; |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SETTING; 11-15-2018; |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing Intervention of Cases - Stipulated |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 014: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE; 05-10-2018; TELEPHONIC STATUS @ 9:15AM; |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) STATUS CONFERENCE SETTING; 05-03-2018; |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference 014: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE; 05-10-2018; TELEPHONIC STATUS @ 9:15AM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.