Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hack, Clifford L, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Sperline, Jeffrey T., against Brooks, Brandon L, Brooks, Justin, Brooks, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Vic L. VanderSchoor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVic L. VanderSchoor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report Status |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return On Letter |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw Robert McMillen |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 026: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 024: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 03-03-2017; MSC/PLTF MT FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION; |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; PER/ AMANDA @ SPERLINE RAEKES-AAM; |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 022: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 02-10-2017; MSC/PLTF MT FOR PRELIM INJUCTION; |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 025: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 024: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 03-03-2017; MSC/PLTF MT FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.