Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Green Dragon Investments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Davidson, Cory Michael, against Kuykendall, Tina, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Bruce A. Spanner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce A. Spanner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 026: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE MITCHELL/MUNOZ/TRE/B; |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena 025: ORDER AND SUBPOENA; |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
M Civil Motions Docket - Motions UND/PLTF MT FOR SUBPOENA |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 024: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 023: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 02-02-2018M; UND/PLTF MT FOR SUBPOENA; |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 022: MT/DCLR FOR SUBPOENA; |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release 021: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHEMENT; |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return On 020: RETURN NOT ORIGINAL SIGNATURE; |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Garnishment 018: AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 019: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.