Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Evergreen Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Woehler, Jason L, against Weis, John P, Weis, Maria D, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with JACKIE SHEA-BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACKIE SHEA-BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release 012: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: WILLIAMS PLANT SERVICES LLC , NFN; |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 011: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill 010: INCREASED COST BILL; |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 009: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Garnishment 008: AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 007: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE JACKIE SHEA-BROWN/MUNOZ/RAL/B; |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA; | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
M Civil Motions Docket - Motions TRJ/MOTION FOR JUDICIAL SUBPOENA |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order 006: ORDER; |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 005: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.