Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Assoc Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Pichinevskaya, Galina, Pichinevskaya, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Robert G. Swisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2012 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 029: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application 028: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 027: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 026: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Garnishment 025: AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 024: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 023: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Garnishment 022: AFFIDAVIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.