Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Clover Island Yacht Club, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Walker, Patrick Craig, against North American Marine Industries, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Cameron Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) TRIAL DATE; 12-02-2013; |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) PRETRIAL MGMT CONFERENCE; 11-21-2013; |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SETTING; 10-24-2013; |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Partial Satisfaction of Judgment 017: PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 013: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; 05-31-2013; MSC/COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE CAMERON MITCHELL; |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 016: AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit DECLARATION OF P CRAIG WALKER; |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 015: AMENDED MT FOR ENTRY OF DEF JUDG; |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Courts Request ---: HEARING CANCELLED: COURT'S REQUEST; AMBER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.