Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonzales, Gracie Lee filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 012: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; RENTON POLICE DEPT; |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 010: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED KPD; |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 011: TRANSMITTAL LETTER -COPY FILED BCSO; |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 009: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE MITCHELL/PELLETIER/WATKINS; |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection From Civil Harassment 008: OR FOR PROTECT FROM CIVIL HARASSMEN; |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
CH Civil Harassment HAR/ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 007: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE -RSP; |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 006: TRANSMITTAL LTR - COPY FILED BCSO; |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 005: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED KPD; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.