Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Burns, Brooke J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBurns, Brooke J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2023 |
CategoryTdr Trust/Estate Dispute Resolution |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 |
Motion Hearing DEFAULT Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
||
October 24, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
October 05, 2023 |
Notice of Hearing AMENDED |
||
October 04, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
September 19, 2023 | Motion for Default | ||
August 28, 2023 |
Notice OF SERVICE |
||
August 25, 2023 |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel AMENDED |
||
August 24, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
August 18, 2023 |
Answer TO PETITION |
||
August 18, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.