Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Keelean, Brian, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 |
Agreement ESTATE RESOLUTION AGREEMENT |
||
May 12, 2023 |
Receipts AND SATISFACTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF DIANA M. KEELEAN |
||
May 05, 2023 | Affidavit of Publication | ||
May 02, 2023 |
Creditors Claim DIANA M. KEELEAN |
||
April 13, 2023 | Notice of Appointment and Pendency of Probate | ||
April 13, 2023 | Certificate of Mailing | ||
April 13, 2023 | Notice to Creditors | ||
April 11, 2023 | Case Resolution Personal Representative Guardian Appointed | ||
April 11, 2023 | Order Admitting Will Appt Personal Representative Adj Solv | ||
April 11, 2023 | Letters Testamentary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.