Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rogers, Ramon Miguel filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2023 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Case Resolution Default Judgment | ||
July 21, 2023 | Parenting Plan Final Order | ||
July 21, 2023 | Judgment Final Ord and Findings for Par Plan or Support | ||
July 20, 2023 | Order of Default | ||
July 18, 2023 | Motion for Default | ||
June 14, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
May 30, 2023 | Proposed Parenting Plan | ||
May 30, 2023 | Summons | ||
May 30, 2023 | Cover Sealed Birth Certificate or Paternity Document | ||
May 30, 2023 | Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.