Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Karl, Julie E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKarl, Julie E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2023 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 |
Motion Hearing SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Karl, Julie E |
||
November 03, 2023 |
Reply PETITIONER'S REPLY RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
||
November 03, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit GABRIEL NASH CASSELL - SECOND |
||
November 03, 2023 | Declaration of Mailing | ||
November 03, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit ERIN L. WOODS |
||
October 25, 2023 |
Order RE: PETITIONER'S REPLY DEADLINE TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE |
||
October 20, 2023 |
Stipulation RE: PETITIONER'S REPLY DEADLINE TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit JULIE CASSELL |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Affidavit in Opposition TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
||
September 27, 2023 | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.