Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Johnson, Jessica M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Shane L., Sr, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2023 |
CategorySep Legal Separation |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Case Resolution Consolidated Case | ||
August 08, 2023 |
Order RE: CONSOLIDATION |
||
July 11, 2023 |
Motion Hearing RESTRAINING ORDER AND TEMP ORDERS Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
||
July 07, 2023 |
Order to Show Cause DENIED |
||
July 06, 2023 | Motion for Order to Show Cause | ||
June 26, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit SHANE JOHNSON |
||
June 20, 2023 |
Motion Hearing WAIVE MEDIATION Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
||
June 20, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
June 20, 2023 | Motion for Temporary Family Law Order and Restraining Order | ||
May 24, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit CERTIFICATE OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.