Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barr, Bridget D filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Brooke J. Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrooke J. Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Notice of Absence Unavailability | ||
June 06, 2023 |
Motion Hearing MOTION FOR DEFAULT Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
||
June 06, 2023 | Declaration of Mailing | ||
June 01, 2023 | Proposed Parenting Plan | ||
June 01, 2023 | Notice of Appearance | ||
June 01, 2023 | Response | ||
May 19, 2023 | Motion for Default | ||
May 19, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
May 01, 2023 | Declaration of Mailing | ||
April 25, 2023 | Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.